Singh, Jaskaran (CPSO#: 102219)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Care Centre
1 Bartley Bull Pkwy, Unit 6
Brampton ON  L6W 3T7
Phone: (905) 450-2981
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jaskaran Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Singh ( CPSO# 102219)

Business Address:
The Medical Care Centre
Unit 6
1 Bartley Bull Parkway
Brampton ON  L6W 3T7
Phone Number: (905) 450-2981

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 May 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASKARAN SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014