Singh, Jaspal (CPSO#: 108558)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Feb 2016 to 15 May 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 16 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Feb 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 21 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017