Singh, Manbir (CPSO#: 43819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Delhi, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
940 King Street West
Suite #2
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G4
Phone: (519) 745-7113
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANBIR SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1990