Singh, Munesh Chandra (CPSO#: 57302)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham-Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6633 Highway 7 E, Suite 306
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Canada
Phone: (289) 554-1765
Fax: (289) 554-1762
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Munesh C. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Singh ( CPSO# 57302 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUNESH CHANDRA SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990