Singh, Narendra Chetram (CPSO#: 55886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 82101
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shirley M. Sit Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Singh ( CPSO# 55886 )
Dr. S. Sit ( CPSO# 66708 )

Business Address:
Rutherford Medical Centre
Suite 3
5283 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T2
Phone Number: (905) 264-8311


Corporation Name: Dr. Narendra C. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Singh ( CPSO# 55886 )
Dr. S. Sit ( CPSO# 66708 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2


Corporation Name: S. M. Sit Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Singh ( CPSO# 55886 )
Dr. S. Sit ( CPSO# 66708 )

Business Address:
Rutherford Medical Centre
Suite 3
5283 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T2
Phone Number: (905) 264-8311

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NARENDRA CHETRAM SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1989