Singh, Narendra (CPSO#: 58438)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Dalhousie University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Osler Cardiology Associates
Suite 200
3 Conestoga Drive
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone: (905) 452-9010
Fax: (905) 452-1052
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Georgia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NARENDRA SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1988