Singh, Nina Praveen (CPSO#: 71154)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Nov 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Science Centre
McMaster and Childrens Hospital
P O Box 2000
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75279
Fax: (905) 521-5057
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nina Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Singh ( CPSO# 71154 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Science Centre
McMaster and Childrens Hospital
P O Box 2000
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NINA PRAVEEN SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2002