Singh, Parkash Kaur (CPSO#: 97607)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Aug 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARKASH KAUR SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2017