Singh, Rajiva Ranjan (CPSO#: 56649)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
DMI Professional Building
Suite 113
704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone: (519) 344-2949
Fax: (519) 344-7727
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajiva R. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Singh ( CPSO# 56649 )

Business Address:
113 - 704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone Number: (519) 344-2949

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 882-4325

Business Address:
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 15 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJIVA RANJAN SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 19 May 1986 to 08 Jun 1986
Elective Trainee - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 May 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1998