Singh, Ram Nivas (CPSO#: 62060)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Ranchi University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Director - Pediatric Critical Care
C2-842
Children's Hospital of Western Ont.
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8386
Fax: (519) 685-8766
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.N. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Singh ( CPSO# 62060 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite C2-842
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAM NIVAS SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990