Singh, Ravinder (CPSO#: 76261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
107 Shirriff Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 8K7
Phone: (705) 472-2646
Fax: (705) 476-6543
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ravinder Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Singh ( CPSO# 76261 )

Business Address:
206 - 107 Shirriff Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 8K7
Phone Number: (705) 472-2646

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay General Hospital,Civic Site North Bay
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAVINDER SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2006