Singh, Ruby (CPSO#: 88482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Halton Healthcare Services
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON
L6M 0L8
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ruby Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Singh ( CPSO# 88482 )

Business Address:
7030 Derry Road East
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUBY SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2011