Singh, Sheila Kumari (CPSO#: 71150)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: (905) 521-9992
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 27 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEILA KUMARI SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Research Fellows - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007