Singh, Sheldon Michael Shastri (CPSO#: 76429)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A222
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 83659
Fax: (416) 480-5707
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sheldon M.S. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Singh ( CPSO# 76429 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A222
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELDON MICHAEL SHASTRI SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005