Singh, Tejdip (CPSO#: 60892)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 267-2131
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TEJDIP SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1990