Singh, Tejinder Pal (CPSO#: 53003)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjabi University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 404
4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 297-9570
Fax: (416) 321-2677
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CPM Pain Clinic
1200 Markham Road, Unit 425
Scarborough ON  M1H 3C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-7080
Fax: (406) 538-7072
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T.P. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Singh ( CPSO# 53003 )

Business Address:
CPM Pain Clinic
1200 Markham Road
Unit 425
Scarborough ON  M1H 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 438-7080

Business Address:
404 - 4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 297-9570

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TEJINDER PAL SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1985