Singhal, Hemant (CPSO#: 68436)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Dec 1995