Singhal, Nishma (CPSO#: 79914)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinics
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44160
Fax: (905) 521-1551
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NISHMA SINGHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGHAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2005