Singleton, John David (CPSO#: 59797)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rainy River Medical Clinic
P O Box 278
113 4th Street
Rainy River ON  P0W 1L0
Phone: (807) 852-3222
Fax: (807) 852-3990
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. David Singleton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Singleton ( CPSO# 59797 )

Business Address:
Rainy River Medical Clinic
113 4th Street
PO Box 278
Rainy River ON  P0W 1L0
Phone Number: (907) 852-3222

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DAVID SINGLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGLETON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1989