Singleton, Kathleen Mary (CPSO#: 62189)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Oct 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Oct 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Oct 1998