Singleton, Paul James William (CPSO#: 57990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 4900
Fax: (905) 815-5076
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL JAMES WILLIAM SINGLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGLETON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1989