Singwi, Amita (CPSO#: 82578)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
2nd Floor West Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5888
Fax: (416) 603-5821
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amita Singwi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Singwi ( CPSO# 82578 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Family Health Team
399 Bathurst Street
2 West Wing
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMITA SINGWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGWI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 02 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007