Sinha, Jayaditya Jay (CPSO#: 65316)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Steeple Hill Medical Centre
Suite 205
650 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1A6
Phone: (905) 831-4547
Fax: (905) 831-5109
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jay Sinha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sinha ( CPSO# 65316 )

Business Address:
Steeple Hill Medical Centre
Suite 205
650 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1A6
Phone Number: (905) 831-4547

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAYADITYA JAY SINHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINHA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993