Sinha, Prabhat Kumar (CPSO#: 87781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:L.N. Mithila University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Campbellton Regional Hospital
189 Lily Lake Road
Campbellton NB  E3N 3H3
Phone: (506) 789-5000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
New Brunswick
Nova Scotia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRABHAT KUMAR SINHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2017