Sinha, Roona (CPSO#: 87882)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 22 Nov 2007 to 19 Dec 2007
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Jan 2011 to 18 Feb 2011
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Feb 2011