Sinha, Samir Kumar (CPSO#: 82878)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 475
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 7859
Fax: (416) 586-5113
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samir K. Sinha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sinha ( CPSO# 82878 )

Business Address:
475 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMIR KUMAR SINHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2010