Sinnaeve, Linda Julia Elodie (CPSO#: 53937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
196 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1C1
Phone: (519) 354-2777
Fax: (519) 354-2783
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Sinnaeve Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sinnaeve ( CPSO# 53937 )

Business Address:
196 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1C1
Phone Number: (519) 354-2777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA JULIA ELODIE SINNAEVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINNAEVE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1984 to 14 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1985