Sinoff, Clive Leonard (CPSO#: 58900)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7600 Weston Rd
Unit 70
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8B7
Phone: (289) 371-3500
Fax: (289) 371-3399
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 06 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLIVE LEONARD SINOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINOFF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1987
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1989