Sinyor, Mark Jeremy (CPSO#: 86682)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
Room FG 52
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4070
Fax: (416) 480-4613
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK JEREMY SINYOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINYOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012