Sionit, David (CPSO#: 102757)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Mar 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Ross University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LMC Diabetes and Endocrinology
Suite 17
531 Atkinson Avenue
Thornhill ON  L4J 8L7
Phone: 905-763-8660
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

LMC Diabetes and Endocrinology
Suite 200
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Sionit Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sionit ( CPSO# 102757)

Business Address:
LMC Diabetes and Endocrinology
Suite 17
531 Atkinson Avenue
Vaughan ON  L4J 8L7
Phone Number: (905) 763-8660

Business Address:
200 - 110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 294-0800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Mar 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Mar 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Mar 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Mar 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  David  Sionit  may  practise  medicine  independently in endocrinology and
            metabolism.