Sira, Surjeet Singh (CPSO#: 25354)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jan 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Birmingham, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to request copies of their medical records may contact Pauline Stewart at Record Storage and Retrieval Services: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 230.
Date Received: 17 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 29 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jan 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 2, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Surjeet Singh Sira to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 2, 2017:

Dr. Sira resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction in Canada.
Download Full Document (PDF)