Sirachainan, Nongnuch (CPSO#: 80237)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Mahidol University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Sep 2003 to 15 Dec 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2004