Sirbovan, Jane Elizabeth (CPSO#: 54164)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Names: Sims, Jane Elizabeth (used until: 29 Oct 1989 )     Sirbovan, Jane Elizabeth (used until: 09 Jun 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
Department Of Pathology
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Ext. 6379
Fax: 416-431-8245
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE ELIZABETH SIRBOVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIRBOVAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1985