Sirianni, Giovanna (CPSO#: 79471)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Palliative Care Consultation Team
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Edwards and G. Sirianni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sirianni ( CPSO# 79471 )
Dr. J. Edwards ( CPSO# 79409 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Echocardiography Laboratory
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5201

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Palliative Care Consulation Team
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Toronto Heart Centre
Suite 906
2300 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 1E4
Phone Number: (647) 776-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIOVANNA SIRIANNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIRIANNI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2005