Sirko, Peter Michael (CPSO#: 57940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Civic Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46277
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Sirko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sirko ( CPSO# 57940 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER MICHAEL SIRKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIRKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1988