Sirman, Mehmet Rauf (CPSO#: 51770)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Turkish

Education:Istanbul University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Wilson Site
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 43039
Fax: (416) 242-1025
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2221 Keele Street, suite 304
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (416) 249-9696
Fax: (416) 249-9898
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Canada
Phone: (519) 524-8323
Fax: (519) 524-5579
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEHMET RAUF SIRMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIRMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1997