Sirota, Marcia (CPSO#: 57315)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: Sirota, Marcie (used until: 03 Aug 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Glen Rush Boulevard LL
North York ON  M5N 2V2
Phone: (416) 782-5452
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcia Sirota Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sirota ( CPSO# 57315 )

Business Address:
89 Glen Rush Boulevard
Lower Level
North York ON  M5N 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 782-5452

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCIA SIROTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIROTA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1987