Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Sirzyk, Jeffrey (CPSO#: 63480)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital General de Hawkesbury
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone: (613) 632-1111 Ext. 31004
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Sirzyk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sirzyk ( CPSO# 63480 )

Business Address:
Hawkesbury General Hospital
1111 Rue Ghislain
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Sep 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY SIRZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIRZYK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1992