Sisca, Lyana Isa (CPSO#: 82771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 214
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 707-9900
Fax: (905) 597-8722
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lyana Sisca Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sisca ( CPSO# 82771 )

Business Address:
Suite 214
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone Number: (905) 707-9900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYANA ISA SISCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SISCA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010