Sisto, Alfred (CPSO#: 57295)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Liege, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
37 Thorncliff Place
Ottawa ON  K2H 6L5
Phone: (613) 596-1568
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alfred Sisto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sisto ( CPSO# 57295 )

Business Address:
37 Thorncliffe Place
Nepean ON  K2H 6L5
Phone Number: (613) 596-1568

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALFRED SISTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SISTO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1988