Sit, Shirley Mildred (CPSO#: 66708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rutherford Medical Centre
3-5283 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T2
Phone: (905) 264-8311
Fax: (905) 264-0801
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shirley M. Sit Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Singh ( CPSO# 55886 )
Dr. S. Sit ( CPSO# 66708 )

Business Address:
Rutherford Medical Centre
Suite 3
5283 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T2
Phone Number: (905) 264-8311


Corporation Name: Dr. Narendra C. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Singh ( CPSO# 55886 )
Dr. S. Sit ( CPSO# 66708 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2


Corporation Name: S. M. Sit Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Singh ( CPSO# 55886 )
Dr. S. Sit ( CPSO# 66708 )

Business Address:
Rutherford Medical Centre
Suite 3
5283 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T2
Phone Number: (905) 264-8311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIRLEY MILDRED SIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997