Sitwell, Lucian Donald (CPSO#: 52975)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone: (613) 739-7268
Fax: (613) 739-7023
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.D. Sitwell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sitwell ( CPSO# 52975 )

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ward C2
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-5383

Business Address:
304 - 1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 739-7268

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUCIAN DONALD SITWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SITWELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1987