Siu, Emily Cheryl Yuen-Yee (CPSO#: 95663)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St.
Dept of Family & Community Medicine
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6000
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

85 The East Mall
Toronto ON  M8Z 5W4
Canada
Phone: 416-621-2220
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

157 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Canada
Phone: (416) 362-8822
Fax: (416) 362-8877
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emily C.Y. Siu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Siu ( CPSO# 95663 )

Business Address:
Patient Networks
157 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Phone Number: (416) 362-8822

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Family and Community Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Mar 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY CHERYL YUEN-YEE SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 07 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2013 to 07 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2014