Siu, Lillian Lai-Yun (CPSO#: 63924)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
700 University Avenue
7th floor, Suite 7-624
Toronto, Ontario M5G 1Z5
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2911
Fax: (416) 946-4467
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILLIAN LAI-YUN SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1992