Siu, Samuel Chi Bun (CPSO#: 65914)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Division of Cardiology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3581
Fax: (519) 434-3278
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Siu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Siu ( CPSO# 65914 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital, Division of Cardiology
Room C6-004
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3581

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL CHI BUN SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1992