Siu, Sidney Kin-Hung (CPSO#: 51778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
827 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H7
Phone: (519) 858-4694
Fax: (519) 858-4692
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Newfoundland and Labrador
Nova Scotia
Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIDNEY KIN-HUNG SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1983