Siu, Victoria Mok (CPSO#: 51226)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: Mok, Victoria (used until: 19 Jun 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Medical Genetics Program of
Southwestern Ontario
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 2V5
Phone: (519) 685-8140
Fax: (519) 685-8214
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Victoria Siu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Siu ( CPSO# 51226 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
Medical Genetics Program of Southwestern Ontario
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 2V5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8214

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTORIA MOK SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1985