Sivaji, Ponnuthurai (CPSO#: 69489)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese, Tamil

Education:University of Ceylon, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 218
385 Silver Street Boulevard
Scarborough ON  M1V 0E3
Phone: (416) 298-0644
Fax: (416) 298-4533
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ponnuthurai Sivaji and Dr. Nirmala Sivaji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sivaji ( CPSO# 69385 )
Dr. P. Sivaji ( CPSO# 69489 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital - Grace Division
3030 Birchmont Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2561

Business Address:
218 - 385 Silver Street Boulevard
Scarborough ON  M1V 0E3
Phone Number: (416) 298-0644

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Sri Lanka

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PONNUTHURAI SIVAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVAJI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995