Sivakumaran, Sooriyakumaran Thillainathan (CPSO#: 67764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Apr 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Apr 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Alberta Hospital
Suite 2C2
8440 - 112 Street NW
Edmonton AB  T6G 2B7
Phone: (780) 407-6182
Fax: (780) 407-7942

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOORIYAKUMARAN THILLAINATHAN SIVAKUMARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVAKUMARAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2000