Sivanandan, Ramier (CPSO#: 67702)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1995
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1996